Cintas board members
WebDr. Altman is a member of the John W. Altman Institute for Entrepreneurship Advisory Board. C. Michael Armstrong Retired Chairman of the Board of Trustees, John Hopkins Medicine, Chairman of Comcast and the former Chairman & CEO of … WebSenior Management. Michael L. Thompson. Executive Vice President & Chief Administration Officer. Todd M. Schneider. President & Chief Executive Officer. J. Michael Hansen. Executive Vice President & Chief Financial Officer. Scott D. Farmer. Uniforms and Apparel: Fire Protection: Mats, Mops, Towels: Flame Resistant … Let us know how we can help you and a Cintas representative will contact you … Cintas Corporation Reports First Quarter Fiscal 2024 Revenue and Earnings: Jul. …
Cintas board members
Did you know?
WebApr 1, 2024 · The company said its Board elected Todd Schneider as Chief Executive Officer & President and a Director of the company, effective June 1, 2024. The Board of …
WebCintas employee-partners are guided by long-standing social and governance principles. High ethical and moral values, diversity and inclusion, world-class health and safety standards, and responsible policies and practices are all at the heart of how we do business. WebJul 2, 2024 · Cintas Corp. has added a director, doubling its number of women board members. Karen Carnahan, who had been treasurer of Cintas (Nasdaq: CTAS) and …
WebCINTAS Fellowships acknowledge creative accomplishments and encourage excellence in architecture & design, creative writing, music composition, photography and the visual arts. ... Applications are … Webmembers of the Audit Committee. Members of the Audit Committee shall serve at the pleasure of the Board until the Board determines it is in the best interest of Cintas to …
WebThe independent Directors are Joseph J. Echevarria, Philip Giordano, Jesse A. Lynn, Scott Letier, Nichelle Maynard-Elliott, Steven Miller, James Nelson and Margarita Paláu-Hernández. Steve Bandrowczak, our Chief Executive Officer, …
WebApr 8, 2024 · Cintas Corporation CEO and Chairman Scott Farmer (left) will retire as CEO on May 31, 2024 after 18 years in the role and 40 years at the company. He will be succeeded as CEO by Todd M. Schneider (right), the company’s current Executive Vice President and Chief Operating Officer, on June 1, 2024. dawn harper actorWebmembers of the Audit Committee. Members of the Audit Committee shall serve at the pleasure of the Board until the Board determines it is in the best interest of Cintas to rotate Committee members or until such Audit Committee member is no longer a Board member. (3) Chair – The Board shall appoint, based on the recommendation of the Nominating and dawn haroldWebApr 11, 2024 · CINCINNATI, April 11, 2024 -- ( BUSINESS WIRE )-- Cintas Corporation (Nasdaq: CTAS) today elected Martin "Marty" Mucci to its Board of Directors, effective … gateway login glasshouse christian collegeWebApr 13, 2024 · April 13, 2024 Cintas Corp. has appointed Martin “Marty” Mucci to its board of directors. Mucci is currently chairman of the board at Rochester, New York-based … gateway login forgot passwordWebApr 1, 2024 · Cintas Corp. Chairman Scott D. Farmer (left) retired as CEO on May 31 after 18 years in the role and 40 years with the company. He was succeeded as CEO by Todd M. Schneider (right) on June 1. (Photo Credit: Cintas Corp.) Cintas Corp., Mason, OH, today announced that Scott Farmer, Cintas’ chairman & CEO, will retire as CEO on May 31. gateway login for xfinity routerWebBoard Seat Contact Info; Todd Schneider: Chief Executive Officer & Board Member: Jim Rozakis: Chief Operating Officer, Operations & President: J. Hansen: Chief Financial … dawn harrellWebApplications are reviewed by panels of qualified members from each artistic discipline. The Board of the CINTAS Foundation, Inc., awards fellowships based on the … dawn harper nrdd.fandom.com